About Me:
I am a Ghanaian educated at the University of Cape Coast, Cape Coast, in Ghana.
I currently hold a Master of Business Administration in Accounting with 10 years of working experience in the accounting field in the shipping, oil, and gas industry with both practical and theoretical application.
As a financial manager, I am responsible for providing financial guidance and support to clients and colleagues so they can make sound business decisions.
I have been involved in clear budgetary planning for both the short and long term and have provided advice on the financial implications of any decision before proceeding.
In addition, I also ensure care is taken to ensure that financial practices are in line with all statutory legislation and regulations.
Responsibilities
The roles I have undertaken include the following:
- Providing and interpreting financial information
- Monitoring and interpreting cash flows and predicting future trends
- Analysing change and advising accordingly
- Formulating strategic and long-term business plans
- Researching and reporting on factors influencing business performance
- Developing financial management mechanisms that minimise financial risk
- Conducting reviews and evaluations for cost-reduction opportunities
- Managing financial accounting, monitoring and reporting systems
- Liaising with auditors to ensure annual monitoring is carried out
- Developing external relationships with appropriate contacts, e.g. Auditors, solicitors, bankers and statutory organisations such as the inland revenue
- Producing accurate financial reports to specific deadlines
- Managing budgets
- Arranging new sources of finance for a company’s debt facilities
- Supervising staff
- Keeping abreast of changes in financial regulations and legislation.
Work Experience:
2019 to Date: Chief Finance Officer – Feed Needy Foundation
2011 to Date: General Manager – Finance & Administration – FlatC Marine Offshore Ltd
20 September 2010 – 30 November 2010: Census field Officer (Supervisor) – Ghana Statistical Service
14 October 2009 – 31 August 2010: Bookkeeping Assistant/Data collector and entry operator – Ghana Statistical Service, Sekondi.
20 June 2007 – 08 July 2007: Script checker – West Africa Examination Council, Sekondi Branch
15 September 2003 – 20 July 2005: Teacher – Otuam International School
01 September 2005 – 03 June 2009: Transport officer/Organiser – Ghana Methodist Students Union, UCC Local, Cape
2011 to 2015: Accountant for FlatC Marine Offshore Limited, Ghana
2015 to Date: General Manager (Finance & Administration) for FlatC Marine Offshore Limited, Ghana
Education And Qualifications
06 October 2018 – 30 September 2020: Master of Business Administration (Accounting) – University of Cape Coast, Cape Coast (Ghana)
06 August 2005 – 22 May 2009: Bachelor of Commerce – University of Cape Coast, Cape Coast (Ghana)
07 January 2001 – 15 August 2003: Business – Apam Senior High School, Gomoa Apam (Ghana)